OK SB1212 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; modifying inclusions on unlawful carry; allowing firearms to be carried without a license. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; modifying inclusions on unlawful carry; allowing firearms to be carried without a license. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 61 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateVetoed 05/11/2018
2018-05-03SenateSent to Governor
2018-05-02HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-05-02SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-05-02SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-05-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9
2018-05-02SenateHAs adopted AYES: 32 NAYS: 11
2018-04-26SenateHAs read
2018-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 28
2018-04-25HouseAyes: 61 Nays: 24
2018-04-25HouseAmended
2018-04-25HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen, Silk, Leewright, Murdock
2018-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Coody, Strohm, Calvey, Moore, Humphrey, Hilbert, Frix, Gann, Cleveland, Babinec, Jordan, West (Kevin), Enns, Murphey, Downing, McBride, Faught, ODonnell, Lawson, Bennett (John), West (Rick), Russ, Tadlock, McEachin, Derby, West (Josh), McDugle
2018-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-12HouseCR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2018-04-06HouseReferred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2018-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2018-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-02-15SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1212&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1212%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB1212%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB1212%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB1212%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1212%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB1212%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1212_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1212_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback