OK SB121 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB121
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools employees; directing Boards of Education to adopt certain policies for employees who are lactating. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools employees; directing Boards of Education to adopt certain policies for employees who are lactating. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Carri Hicks [D] | Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Trish Ranson [D] |
Rep. John Waldron [D] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Jo Dossett [D] | Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] |
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 |
2021-04-14 | House | General Order |
2021-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Floyd |
2021-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2021-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Ranson |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Bush |
2021-02-11 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Bush and substitute with Representative Hasenbeck |
2021-02-11 | Senate | remove as coauthor Representative(s) Hasenbeck |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Hasenbeck |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB121 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021