OK SB121 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools employees; directing Boards of Education to adopt certain policies for employees who are lactating. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools employees; directing Boards of Education to adopt certain policies for employees who are lactating. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateApproved by Governor 04/21/2021
2021-04-15SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-04-14SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-14HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
2021-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-06HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Floyd
2021-04-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
2021-04-06HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2021-03-02HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-02SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-01SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-01SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
2021-03-01SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Kirt
2021-02-15Senatecoauthored by Ranson
2021-02-11Senatecoauthored by Bush
2021-02-11Senateremove as principal author Representative Bush and substitute with Representative Hasenbeck
2021-02-11Senateremove as coauthor Representative(s) Hasenbeck
2021-02-10Senatecoauthored by Hasenbeck
2021-02-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.)
2021-02-10SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
2021-02-09SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateCoauthored by Senator David
2021-02-02SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanley
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2021-02-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Hicks
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb121&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB121%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB121%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB121%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB121%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB121%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB121%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB121%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB121%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB121_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB121_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback