OK SB1205 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Measure failed: Ayes: 11 Nays: 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Measure failed: Ayes: 11 Nays: 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; allowing certain individualized plan to be developed as early as the sixth grade. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; allowing certain individualized plan to be developed as early as the sixth grade. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 11 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 11 Nays: 31 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |