OK SB1203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying certain fines and court costs. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying certain fines and court costs. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07SenateApproved by Governor 05/07/2018
2018-05-01SenateSent to Governor
2018-05-01HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-04-30SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-04-30SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2018-04-30SenateHAs adopted
2018-04-24SenateHAs read
2018-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2018-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-12HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Allen
2018-04-12HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
2018-03-14SenateTitle restored
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-02-15SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-15SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2018-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Sykes
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711801New CodeSee Bill Text
4711801eAmended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1203&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1203%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB1203%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB1203%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1203%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB1203%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1203%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1203%20HASB.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB1203%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1203_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1203_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback