OK SB1203 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - coauthored by Bennett
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - coauthored by Bennett
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; amending application fees and renewal fees. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; amending application fees and renewal fees. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Calvey (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1290 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 20 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1203&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1203%20INT.PDF |