OK SB1200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement training; modifying certain appointment authorization for CLEET; providing for Advisory Council membership; requiring certain application process approval for technology center schools. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement training; modifying certain appointment authorization for CLEET; providing for Advisory Council membership; requiring certain application process approval for technology center schools. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |