OK SB1199 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring certain revenue and expenditure data or a link to such data to be posted on certain website. Effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring certain revenue and expenditure data or a link to such data to be posted on certain website. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |