OK SB1194 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Nichols (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Nichols (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations; making an appropriation to the Historical Society in support of the U.S. Civil Rights Trail Campaign. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Appropriations; making an appropriation to the Historical Society in support of the U.S. Civil Rights Trail Campaign. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nichols (principal House author) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Matthews |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |