OK SB1189 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oil and gas; modifying the 2011 Shale Reservoir Development Act. Emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; modifying the 2011 Shale Reservoir Development Act. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Approved by Governor 05/16/2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-09 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-09 | HAs read | |
2012-04-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 | |
2012-04-04 | General Order | |
2012-03-28 | Title restored | |
2012-03-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-05 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |