OK SB1185 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Tourism, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Tourism, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma resident honorably discharged veterans; modifying documentation requirements for free admission to all state-owned or state-operated parks and museums. Emergency.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma resident honorably discharged veterans; modifying documentation requirements for free admission to all state-owned or state-operated parks and museums. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Tourism, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2020-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |