OK SB1177 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; creating special license plate for recipients of Combat Action Ribbon. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; creating special license plate for recipients of Combat Action Ribbon. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26HouseTitle restored
2014-03-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2014-03-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2014-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2014-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2014-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2014-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2014-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2014-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2014-02-12Senatecoauthored by Shortey
2014-02-12SenateReferred to Finance
2014-02-12SenateReported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
2014-02-04Senatecoauthored by Denney (principal House author)
2014-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee
2014-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Halligan
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711352New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback