OK SB1176 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1176

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Approved by Governor 03/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; Large-scale Economic Activity and Development Act of 2022; modifying certain job threshold requirement; requiring transfer of funds if certain commitment is not received by the Oklahoma Department of Commerce by certain date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; Large-scale Economic Activity and Development Act of 2022; modifying certain job threshold requirement; requiring transfer of funds if certain commitment is not received by the Oklahoma Department of Commerce by certain date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: if certain commitment is not received (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Joint Committee On Appropriations And Budget Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateApproved by Governor 03/02/2023
2023-03-02SenateSent to Governor
2023-03-02HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled, to House
2023-03-02SenateReferred for enrollment
2023-03-02HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-03-02HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13
2023-03-02HouseJCR adopted
2023-03-02HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-01HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2023-02-28HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-28SenateEngrossed to House
2023-02-28SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-02-28SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
2023-02-28SenateJCR adopted
2023-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2023-02-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2023-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez
2023-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2023-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Hall
2023-02-20SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
2023-02-20SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB1176 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - Approved by Governor 03/02/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1176&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB1176%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1176%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB1176%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB1176%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB1176%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1176%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1176%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1176%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1176%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1176_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1176_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback