OK SB1170 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Elections; allowing cancellation of voter registration of deceased voter who died in line of duty upon notification from military. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; allowing cancellation of voter registration of deceased voter who died in line of duty upon notification from military. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-02 Sent to Governor
2012-05-02 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-02 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-01 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-01 Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-05-01 HAs adopted
2012-04-04 HAs read
2012-04-04 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-03 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-03 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2012-04-03 Amended
2012-04-03 General Order
2012-03-28 CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-03-07 First Reading
2012-03-07 Engrossed to House
2012-03-06 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-06 Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-03-06 General Order, Considered
2012-02-28 coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
2012-02-28 Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Stanislawski
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
264120New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback