OK SB117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB117
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Employment Security Administration Fund; appropriation; specifying source; requiring compliance. Effective date.
Title
Employment Security Administration Fund; appropriation; specifying source; requiring compliance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-02-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (principal House author) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB117 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017