OK SB1157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Aircraft excise tax; modifying apportionment of tax after specified date; deleting obsolete language. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Aircraft excise tax; modifying apportionment of tax after specified date; deleting obsolete language. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] |
Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Mize |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2020-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Townley |
2020-02-18 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Townley and substitute with Representative Kannady |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley (principal House author) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |