OK SB1156 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
County officers and public records; updating statutory language relating to copying and storing county records. Effective date.
Title
County officers and public records; updating statutory language relating to copying and storing county records. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-25 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2016-04-27 | Senate | SCs named Dahm, Fry, Holt, Justice, Sykes, Floyd, Matthews |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 7 |
2016-04-19 | House | Amended |
2016-04-19 | House | General Order |
2016-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2016-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 130 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 138 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 138 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 138 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 174 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 866 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |