OK SB1154 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - coauthored by Moore
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; creating the Eagle Scout license plate; providing for distribution of certain funds. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; creating the Eagle Scout license plate; providing for distribution of certain funds. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01Senatecoauthored by Moore
2018-03-01SenateCoauthored by Representative Cleveland (principal House author)
2018-02-27SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Scott
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711355New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback