OK SB1152 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use tax; repealing exemption for qualified purchases pursuant to Oklahoma Research and Development Incentives Act. Effective date.
Title
Sales and use tax; repealing exemption for qualified purchases pursuant to Oklahoma Research and Development Incentives Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |