OK SB1151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer loans; electronic payments; authorizing convenience fee; maximum charge amount. Effective date.
Title
Consumer loans; electronic payments; authorizing convenience fee; maximum charge amount. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 10 |
2018-04-18 | House | General Order |
2018-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |