OK SB1149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax refunds; eliminating prohibition against release of information by Oklahoma Tax Commission. Emergency.
Title
Income tax refunds; eliminating prohibition against release of information by Oklahoma Tax Commission. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19 |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dugger |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |