OK SB1148 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Physician licensure; relating to Oklahoma Allopathic Medical and Surgical Licensure and Supervision Act; prohibiting certain construction. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician licensure; relating to Oklahoma Allopathic Medical and Surgical Licensure and Supervision Act; prohibiting certain construction. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-12SenateApproved by Governor 04/11/2016
2016-04-05SenateSent to Governor
2016-04-05HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-04-05SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-04-04SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-04-04HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-04-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2016-04-04HouseGeneral Order
2016-03-23HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2016-03-09HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2016-03-02HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-02SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-01SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-01SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2016-03-01SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2016-02-15SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-02-16Senatecoauthored by Ritze (principal House author)
2016-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Crain
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback