OK SB1143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; modifying certain proceeds to become non-interest accruing. Effective date.
Title
Oil and gas; modifying certain proceeds to become non-interest accruing. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |