OK SB1140 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; prohibiting requirement for private agencies to participate in certain placements; prohibiting certain actions based on religious or moral convictions. Effective date.
Title
Children; prohibiting requirement for private agencies to participate in certain placements; prohibiting certain actions based on religious or moral convictions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Travis Dunlap [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 22 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House: ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 57 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: OBJECT TO CONSIDERATION OF THE CCR (Y: 20 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 69 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 44 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 22 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House: ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 57 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: OBJECT TO CONSIDERATION OF THE CCR (Y: 20 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 69 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 44 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/11/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby |
2018-05-03 | House | Motion expired |
2018-05-03 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Dunlap |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 21 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ayes: 57 Nays: 24 |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Cleveland |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR considered |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Gann |
2018-05-01 | Senate | SCs named Treat, Yen, Brecheen, Daniels, Dahm, Pittman, Dossett |
2018-04-30 | House | Conference granted, HC's named Lepak, Cleveland, Kannady, Babinec, Downing, Worthen, Lawson, Perryman, Meredith, Gaddis |
2018-04-30 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | House | Ayes: 63 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2018-04-26 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Dunlap |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 26 |
2018-04-26 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-26 | House | Ayes: 38 Nays: 23 |
2018-04-26 | House | Motion to table amendment adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John), Strohm |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dunlap (principal House author) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |