OK SB114 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; authorizing state agencies to provide change of address information to State Election Board. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; authorizing state agencies to provide change of address information to State Election Board. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-19HouseTo Senate
2015-05-19HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 10
2015-05-19HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-18HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-18SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2015-05-18SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-15SenateCCR read
2015-05-11HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
2015-04-29SenateSCs named Stanislawski, Justice, Holt, Griffin, Bice, Matthews, Wyrick
2015-04-27SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-20SenateHAs read
2015-04-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-16HouseMotion expired
2015-04-14HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Shelton
2015-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20
2015-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2015-03-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2015-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2015-03-02Senatecoauthored by Newberry
2015-03-02Senatecoauthored by Walker (principal House author)
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
264116New CodeSee Bill Text
264118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
264120New CodeSee Bill Text
267115New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb114&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB114%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB114%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB114%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB114%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB114%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB114%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB114%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB114%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB114_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB114_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback