OK SB1139 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Militia; changing name of 45th Infantry Division Museum to Oklahoma National Guard Museum. Effective date.
Title
Militia; changing name of 45th Infantry Division Museum to Oklahoma National Guard Museum. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |