OK SB1137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; state-owned vehicles; authorizing certain individuals to use state-owned or state-leased vehicles for certain transportation. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; state-owned vehicles; authorizing certain individuals to use state-owned or state-leased vehicles for certain transportation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 12 |
2022-04-28 | House | Amended |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |