OK SB1136 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Product liability; modifying requirements for certain actions. Effective date.
Title
Product liability; modifying requirements for certain actions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Downing (principal House author) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |