OK SB1128 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Conditions of employment; prohibiting certain vaccinations and medications as a condition of continued employment. Emergency.
Title
Conditions of employment; prohibiting certain vaccinations and medications as a condition of continued employment. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Stephens [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Sen. Cody Rogers [R] | Sen. Jake Merrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Merrick |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stephens |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |