OK SB1127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bail bondsmen; modifying qualifications for licensure. Effective date.
Title
Bail bondsmen; modifying qualifications for licensure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-22 | coauthored by Kirby (principal House author) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Justice | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |