OK SB1120 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


Medical marijuana; regulating the use and sale of medical marijuana. Conditional effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Medical marijuana; regulating the use and sale of medical marijuana. Conditional effective date.



2018-03-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-19SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 11
2018-03-15SenateBacked up to General Order
2018-03-15SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 35 Nays: 1
2018-03-12SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Yen
2018-03-12SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 20
2018-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-03-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
2018-02-26SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-26SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Yen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6312801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6312810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632309DNew CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

Bill Comments