OK SB1120 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-30 - Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; declaring the English language to be the official language of this state; requiring the business of this state be conducted in English; providing ballot title; directing filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; declaring the English language to be the official language of this state; requiring the business of this state be conducted in English; providing ballot title; directing filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-30 Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Judiciary Committee
2009-04-07 Title restored
2009-04-07 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2009-03-18 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2009-03-11 First Reading
2009-03-11 Engrossed to House
2009-03-10 Referred for engrossment
2009-03-10 Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2009-03-10 General Order, Considered
2009-02-23 coauthored by Terrill (principal House author)
2009-02-23 Title stricken
2009-02-23 Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2009-02-18 Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR
2009-02-16 Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill
2009-02-09 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2009-02-02 Authored by Senator Sykes
2009-02-02 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25307New CodeSee Bill Text
516New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback