OK SB112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; prohibiting life without parole for juveniles. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; prohibiting life without parole for juveniles. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Virgin (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Title stricken