OK SB112 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Rereferred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Rereferred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crime and punishment; required service of prison sentence; modifying eligibility requirements for earned credits. Effective date.
Title
Crime and punishment; required service of prison sentence; modifying eligibility requirements for earned credits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |