OK SB1119 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Commerce; directing creation of Future of Oklahoma Industry and Labor (FOIL) report; directing annual publication; directing agency collaboration. Effective date.
Title
Department of Commerce; directing creation of Future of Oklahoma Industry and Labor (FOIL) report; directing annual publication; directing agency collaboration. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |