OK SB1116 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial motor vehicles; disqualifications from driving privileges for certain convictions or acts. Effective date.
Title
Commercial motor vehicles; disqualifications from driving privileges for certain convictions or acts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2022 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |