OK SB1115 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher certification; allowing the State Board of Education to renew an emergency or provisional certificate. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher certification; allowing the State Board of Education to renew an emergency or provisional certificate. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateApproved by Governor 05/21/2020
2020-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2020-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3
2020-05-15HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2020-05-15HouseGeneral Order
2020-05-06HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2020-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
2020-03-10SenateTitle restored
2020-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-25SenateEmergency removed
2020-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2020-02-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Sterling (principal House author)
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Sharp
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback