OK SB111 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Holidays; changing date of designation for Oklahoma Native American Day. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holidays; changing date of designation for Oklahoma Native American Day. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateApproved by Governor 04/25/2019
2019-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 17
2019-04-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Vancuren, Boles, Caldwell (Trey), Ranson, Pittman
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Osburn, Branham, Kiger, Albright, Luttrell
2019-03-27HouseRemove Representative Osburn as principal House author and substitute with Representative Walke
2019-03-27HouseCR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2019-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
2019-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback