OK SB1108 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; modifying information to be printed on ballots. Effective date.
Title
Elections; modifying information to be printed on ballots. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Gary Banz [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 59 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/11/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion expired |
2016-03-31 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Banz |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 20; Ayes: 59 Nays: 19 |
2016-03-31 | House | General Order |
2016-03-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2016-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 10 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 2 | 128 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 6 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 6 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 7 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |