OK SB1108 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bonds; creating the Council of Bond Oversight; making certain commissions obsolete; repealing 62 O.S. 2011, sections 695.4, 695.5, 695.6, and 695.11. Effective date.
Title
Bonds; creating the Council of Bond Oversight; making certain commissions obsolete; repealing 62 O.S. 2011, sections 695.4, 695.5, 695.6, and 695.11. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Approved by Governor 05/21/2012 | |
2012-05-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-14 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-14 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-16 | HAs read | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19 | |
2012-04-12 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | Title restored | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-20 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) | |
2012-02-20 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-20 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 695 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 11A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 6a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 7a | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |