OK SB1105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highways; establishing Gold Star Families Highway. Effective date.
Title
Memorial highways; establishing Gold Star Families Highway. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |