OK SB1105 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Education; directing school districts to provide certain age-appropriate instruction about HIV, AIDS and related issues. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; directing school districts to provide certain age-appropriate instruction about HIV, AIDS and related issues. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10
2018-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15
2018-03-14SenateEmergency clause restored
2018-03-14SenateTitle restored
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-03-08Senateremove as principal author Representative Henke and substitute with Representative McEntire
2018-03-07Senateremove as principal author Representative Kannady and substitute with Representative Henke
2018-03-05Senatecoauthored by Virgin
2018-03-01SenateCoauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
2018-02-26SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Griffin
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7011103Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback