OK SB1105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Subject matter standards; providing for students who have failed to meet certain requirements to re-enroll. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Subject matter standards; providing for students who have failed to meet certain requirements to re-enroll. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House: RECONSIDER EMERGENCY (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 11 |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 65 Nays: 5 |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2016-04-07 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody (Ann) |
2016-04-07 | House | Emergency failed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 33 |
2016-04-07 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody (Ann) |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 29 |
2016-04-07 | House | General Order |
2016-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2016-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (Ann) (principal House author) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by Stanislawski |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 11 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 526 | New Code | See Bill Text |