OK SB1103 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; requiring coverage of certain mammography. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance; requiring coverage of certain mammography. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 22 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 22 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 |
2018-04-24 | House | General Order |
2018-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |