OK SB1101 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; creating the Insurance Business Transfer Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; creating the Insurance Business Transfer Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07SenateApproved by Governor 05/07/2018
2018-05-01SenateSent to Governor
2018-05-01HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-05-01SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-05-01SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2018-05-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-05-01SenateHAs adopted
2018-04-18SenateHAs read
2018-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 1
2018-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-11HouseTitle restored
2018-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Moore
2018-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author)
2018-02-12SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Sparks
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1101&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1101%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB1101%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB1101%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1101%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB1101%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1101%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB1101%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1101_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1101_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback