OK SB110 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vital records; permitting Department of Human Services and Department of Health to share certain information electronically. Effective date.
Title
Vital records; permitting Department of Human Services and Department of Health to share certain information electronically. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Standridge |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Standridge; authored by Yen |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 7505 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 240 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 321 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 323 | New Code | See Bill Text |