OK SB1098 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Classification of felony crimes; creating the Criminal Justice Reclassification Coordination Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classification of felony crimes; creating the Criminal Justice Reclassification Coordination Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateApproved by Governor 05/10/2018
2018-05-03SenateSent to Governor
2018-05-03HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-05-03SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-05-03HouseTo Senate
2018-05-03HouseMotion expired
2018-05-03HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Worthen
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 31; Ayes: 51 Nays: 31
2018-05-03HouseCCR adopted
2018-05-02HouseCCR submitted
2018-05-02SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2018-05-02SenateCCR adopted
2018-05-01SenateCCR read
2018-05-01HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateSCs named Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Matthews, Floyd
2018-05-01SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2018-04-26SenateHAs read
2018-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14
2018-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-16HouseEmergency added
2018-04-16HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Allen
2018-04-16HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2018-03-13SenateTitle restored
2018-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
2018-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-27SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2117091Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1098&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1098%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1098%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB1098%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB1098%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1098%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB1098%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1098%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB1098%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB1098%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1098_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1098_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback