OK SB1094 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax; eliminating exemption for certain property to be used in new or expanding manufacturing facility. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; eliminating exemption for certain property to be used in new or expanding manufacturing facility. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-03-02HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-02SenateEngrossed to House
2020-02-27SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-02-27SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2020-02-27SenateTitle restored
2020-02-27SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-02-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author)
2020-02-11SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback