OK SB1094 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Measure failed: Ayes: 1 Nays: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; removing certain authority of Attorney General. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; removing certain authority of Attorney General. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 1 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 1 Nays: 41
2018-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Ritze (principal House author)
2018-02-12SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5610119New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback