OK SB1092 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Mazzei
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Mazzei
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco products tax; limiting amounts apportioned after certain date; providing for deposit of funds in excess of limit. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Tobacco products tax; limiting amounts apportioned after certain date; providing for deposit of funds in excess of limit. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |